KS SB348 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-26 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Qualifications for office of sheriff.
Title
Qualifications for office of sheriff.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 19, 2014, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2014-03-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-05 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 13, 2014, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Senate Introduced |