KS SB346 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the insurance department to retain the proceeds of the sale of insurance department surplus real estate and any improvements thereon in the insurance department service regulation fund.
Title
Authorizing the insurance department to retain the proceeds of the sale of insurance department surplus real estate and any improvements thereon in the insurance department service regulation fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 31 Nay: 8 (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-18 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-18 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 31 Nay: 8 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 14, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S - CANCELED |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 12, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |