KS SB345 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing requirements for the effective disposal of industrial hemp.
Title
Establishing requirements for the effective disposal of industrial hemp.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 3 (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N - CANCELED |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 3 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Introduced |