KS SB340 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died in Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing automobile club from the definition of person for purposes of enforcing penalties for violations of insurance law.
Title
Removing automobile club from the definition of person for purposes of enforcing penalties for violations of insurance law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-14 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 115 Nay: 7 (Y: 115 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died in Conference |
2024-03-19 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Sutton, Representative Clifford and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Longbine , Senator Fagg and Senator Holscher as conferees |
2024-03-14 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 115 Nay: 7 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance |
2024-03-04 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 4, 2024, 3:30 PM Room 218-N |
2024-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Insurance |
2024-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 9:30 AM Room 546-S |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2024-01-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |