KS SB34 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Penalties for voting crimes; prosecution of election crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penalties for voting crimes; prosecution of election crimes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 67 Nay: 55 (Y: 67 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Be passed - Yea: 63 Nay: 57 (Y: 63 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected - Yea: 30 Nay: 91 (Y: 30 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected - Yea: 34 Nay: 86 (Y: 34 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected - Yea: 46 Nay: 75 (Y: 46 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was rejected - Yea: 57 Nay: 64 (Y: 57 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-05-20 - House - House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was rejected - Yea: 60 Nay: 61 (Y: 60 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 23 Nay: 17 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected - Yea: 15 Nay: 23 (Y: 15 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-08SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, June 08 , 2015
2015-05-29SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 29, 2015
2015-05-21HouseHouse Final Action - Passed; Yea: 67 Nay: 55
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed Yea: 63 Nay: 57
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Carmichael was rejected Yea: 30 Nay: 91
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Carmichael
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Frownfelter was rejected Yea: 34 Nay: 86
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Frownfelter
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Ward was rejected Yea: 46 Nay: 75
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Ward
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was rejected Yea: 57 Nay: 64
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Jennings was rejected Yea: 60 Nay: 61
2015-05-20HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Jennings
2015-05-20HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2015-05-07HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2015-05-05HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
2015-04-29HouseHouse Withdrawn from Committee on Taxation; Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-03-25HouseHouse Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation
2015-03-18HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
2015-03-06HouseHouse Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112
2015-02-26HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-02-26HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2015-02-25SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 23 Nay: 17
2015-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2015-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was rejected Yea: 15 Nay: 23
2015-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - offered by Senator Haley
2015-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was rejected
2015-02-24SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco
2015-02-10SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by
2015-01-22SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, January 29, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S
2015-01-16SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Judiciary
2015-01-15SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/sb34/
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb34_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb34_enrolled.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150224154625_138889/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150225154426_962733/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150520115354_379706/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150520120202_519866/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150520121152_430353/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150520122306_901084/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150520124032_966996/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150520130444_184915/
Roll Callhttp://www.kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/vote_view/je_20150521111119_374412/

Bill Comments

feedback