KS SB334 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the time that taxpayers may carry forward the high performance incentive program tax credit.
Title
Extending the time that taxpayers may carry forward the high performance incentive program tax credit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Commerce |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Commerce |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 07, 2018, 08:30 AM Room 548-S |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate Introduced |