KS SB331 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the definition of lead-free and an exception for leaded joints in the public water supply systems law and updating terminology relating to hazardous waste generated by certain persons.
Title
Removing the definition of lead-free and an exception for leaded joints in the public water supply systems law and updating terminology relating to hazardous waste generated by certain persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 122 Nay: 1 (Y: 122 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 34 Nay: 0 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, April 4, 2024 |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, April 2, 2024 |
2024-03-26 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 122 Nay: 1 |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2024-03-07 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Water |
2024-03-07 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 7, 2024, 9:00 AM Room 218-N |
2024-03-04 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources; Referred to Committee on Water |
2024-02-01 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-02-01 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 34 Nay: 0 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, January 23, 2024, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Friday, January 5, 2024 |