KS SB325 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 325 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice -- Distribution of controlled substances to health care providers, mammogram reporting and notice requirements.
Title
House Substitute for SB 325 by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice -- Distribution of controlled substances to health care providers, mammogram reporting and notice requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Tuesday, March 13, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2012-02-20 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-16 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-15 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-15 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-01 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing: Tuesday, January 31, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 546-S | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced |