KS SB320 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Juvenile offender cases; probable cause determinations.
Title
Juvenile offender cases; probable cause determinations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 03 April 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 30, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | Concurred with amendments; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-21 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 144-S | |
2012-02-20 | Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice | |
2012-02-17 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-16 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-15 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-02-13 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Thursday, February 09, 2012, 8:25 AM Room 548-S | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced |