KS SB311 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 311 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation – Providing a sales tax exemption for certain purchases and sales by the Johnson county Christmas bureau association.
Title
Substitute for SB 311 by Committee on Assessment and Taxation – Providing a sales tax exemption for certain purchases and sales by the Johnson county Christmas bureau association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |