KS SB303 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Senate Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Kansas legal tender act and providing for an income tax subtraction modification for sales of specie.
Title
Establishing the Kansas legal tender act and providing for an income tax subtraction modification for sales of specie.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Died on Calendar |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |