KS SB293 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Transferring duties concerning registration for charitable organizations and the address confidentiality program (safe at home) from the secretary of state to the attorney general.
Title
Transferring duties concerning registration for charitable organizations and the address confidentiality program (safe at home) from the secretary of state to the attorney general.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 30, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |