KS SB287 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Kansas storage tank act by extending the expiration of certain reimbursement provisions to 2030 and increasing the underground storage tank replacement reimbursement maximum.
Title
Amending the Kansas storage tank act by extending the expiration of certain reimbursement provisions to 2030 and increasing the underground storage tank replacement reimbursement maximum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 12, 2020, 3:30 PM Room 582-N |
2020-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Appropriations; Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2020-02-24 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-24 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 7, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 159-S |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 5, 2020, 8:30 AM Room 159-S - CANCELED |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Senate Introduced |