KS SB286 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Use of credit report for employment decisions.
Title
Use of credit report for employment decisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Commerce | |
2012-02-23 | Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/sb286/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2011_12/measures/documents/sb286_00_0000.pdf |