KS SB282 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing income tax credits for aerospace and aviation program graduates and their employers and a credit for school and classroom supplies purchased by teachers, enacting the Kansas affordable housing tax credit act and the Kansas housing investor tax credit act, providing homestead property tax refunds to certain persons based on the increase in property tax over the base year property tax amount and increasing the extent of the property tax exemption for residential property from the statewide school levy.
Title
Providing income tax credits for aerospace and aviation program graduates and their employers and a credit for school and classroom supplies purchased by teachers, enacting the Kansas affordable housing tax credit act and the Kansas housing investor tax credit act, providing homestead property tax refunds to certain persons based on the increase in property tax over the base year property tax amount and increasing the extent of the property tax exemption for residential property from the statewide school levy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 4 (Y: 33 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 18 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 16 Nay: 18 (Y: 16 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 16, 2022, 3:30 PM Room 346-S |
2022-03-08 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2022-03-08 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 4 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Peck was adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Peck |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Baumgardner was adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Baumgardner |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 16 Nay: 18 |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Tyson was adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Tyson |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Olson was adopted |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Olson |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |