KS SB281 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing unemployment insurance disqualification provisions for fraud, part-time employment for educational institutions and receipt of pensions.
Title
Changing unemployment insurance disqualification provisions for fraud, part-time employment for educational institutions and receipt of pensions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 24, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Introduced |