KS SB28 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 20, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Updating the expiration date of risk-based capital instructions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Updating the expiration date of risk-based capital instructions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-04 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 27 Nay: 8 (Y: 27 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-04 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 87 Nay: 36 (Y: 87 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Monday, May 20, 2019
2019-05-29SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 10, 2019
2019-05-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 27 Nay: 8
2019-05-04SenateSenate Substitute motion to not adopt and appoint a new conference failed.
2019-05-04SenateSenate Motion to adopt Conference Committee Report
2019-05-04SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 87 Nay: 36
2019-05-04HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-04HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Suellentrop, Senator Berger and Senator Bollier appointed as second conferees
2019-05-02SenateSenate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-02HouseHouse Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Patton, Representative Ralph and Representative Carmichael appointed as second conferees
2019-05-02HouseHouse Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted;
2019-05-02HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2019-05-01HouseHouse Representative Patton, Representative Ralph, and Representative Carmichael are appointed to replace Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox, and Representative Neighbor on the Conference Committee
2019-05-01SenateSenate Senator Suellentrop, Senator Berger, and Senator Bollier are appointed to replace Senator Olson, Senator Billinger, and Senator Ware on the Conference Committee
2019-04-01HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Vickrey, Representative Cox and Representative Neighbor appointed as conferees
2019-03-27SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Olson , Senator Billinger and Senator Ware as conferees
2019-03-26HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2019-03-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance
2019-03-11HouseHouse Hearing: Monday, March 11, 2019, 3:30 PM Room 212-N
2019-02-21HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-02-21HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2019-02-20SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0
2019-02-19SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2019-02-05SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-29SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, January 29, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 546-S
2019-01-23SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance
2019-01-22SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback