KS SB274 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the seat belt safety fund; increasing the fine for adult seat belt violations; allowing persons to operate sailboat after completing instruction led class.
Title
Creating the seat belt safety fund; increasing the fine for adult seat belt violations; allowing persons to operate sailboat after completing instruction led class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 33 Nay: 2 (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 09, 2016, 1:30 PM Room 582-N |
2015-04-02 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-04-02 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 33 Nay: 2 |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Haley was withdrawn |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Haley |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Holland was adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Holland |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 8:30 AM Room 546-S |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |