KS SB270 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 20 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-21 - Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 20 March 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Confidentiality and disclosure requirements of charitable gambling information.
Title
Confidentiality and disclosure requirements of charitable gambling information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 108 Nay: 10 (Y: 108 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-02 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Approved by Governor on Tuesday, 20 March 2012 | |
2012-03-16 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 16, 2012 | |
2012-03-09 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 108 Nay: 10 | |
2012-03-08 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2012-03-05 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing: Thursday, March 01, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-02-06 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-02 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-01 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-02-01 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-01-26 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-01-13 | Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 144-S | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-01-11 | Introduced |