KS SB27 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 11 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 11 April 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eligibility of students under the military service scholarship program act.
Title
Eligibility of students under the military service scholarship program act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 0 (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Thursday, 11 April 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, April 08, 2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senate Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-20 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Goico, Representative Gonzalez and Representative Meier appointed as conferees |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Masterson , Senator Denning and Senator Kelly as conferees |
2013-03-19 | House | House Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 0 |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-02-27 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 07, 2013, 9:00 AM Room 152-S |
2013-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Veterans, Military and Homeland Security |
2013-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Engrossed on Wednesday, 20 February 2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate Introduced |