KS SB262 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 14 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Approved by Governor on Monday, 14 May 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Grandparent custody, visitation and residency.
Title
Grandparent custody, visitation and residency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 120 Nay: 0 (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 124 Nay: 0 (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Approved by Governor on Monday, 14 May 2012 | |
2012-05-08 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Tuesday, May 08, 2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-04-30 | Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 120 Nay: 0 | |
2012-04-30 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2012-04-30 | Conference committee report now available | |
2012-03-26 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Kinzer, Representative Patton and Representative Pauls appointed as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Brungardt , Senator Reitz and Senator Faust-Goudeau as conferees | |
2012-03-21 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 124 Nay: 0 | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2012-03-20 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-03-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-03-01 | Hearing: Wednesday, March 07, 2012, 3:30 PM Room 346-S | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-02-29 | Received and Introduced | |
2012-02-23 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was adopted | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau | |
2012-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2012-02-10 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-02-01 | Hearing: Tuesday, February 07, 2012, 10:30 AM Room 144-S | |
2012-01-26 | Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means | |
2012-01-10 | Introduced |