KS SB26 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 5, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the vessel registration fee cap.
Title
Increasing the vessel registration fee cap.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 79 Nay: 43 (Y: 79 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 36 Nay: 4 (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor on Wednesday, April 5, 2017 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, March 31, 2017 |
2017-03-24 | House | House Final Action - Passed; Yea: 79 Nay: 43 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to refer to committee failed Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2017-03-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 14, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 582-N |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 36 Nay: 4 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 25, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 546-S |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |