KS SB25 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Removing the requirement for a public hearing to set cabin fees owned or operated by the department of wildlife, parks and tourism.
Title
Removing the requirement for a public hearing to set cabin fees owned or operated by the department of wildlife, parks and tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 26 Nay: 14 (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-04 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Thursday, March 16, 2017, 01:30 PM Room 112-N |
2017-03-08 | House | House Withdrawn from Committee on Agriculture; Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Economic Development |
2017-02-22 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2017-02-22 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 26 Nay: 14 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Billinger was adopted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Billinger |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, January 19, 2017, 08:30 AM Room 159-S |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |