KS SB249 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
House Substitute for SB 249 - Appropriations for FY 2016, FY 2017 and FY 2018 for various state agencies; omnibus appropriation act of 2016; capital improvement projects; claims against the state.
Title
House Substitute for SB 249 - Appropriations for FY 2016, FY 2017 and FY 2018 for various state agencies; omnibus appropriation act of 2016; capital improvement projects; claims against the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 22 Nay: 18 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 8 (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 63 Nay: 59 (Y: 63 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-21 - House - House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended - Yea: 114 Nay: 8 (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 1 (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate No motion to reconsider line item vetoes; Vetoes sustained |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Approved by Governor except line item veto of Sections 20(b) and 50(c) on Wednesday, May 18, 2016 |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Monday, May 09, 2016 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 22 Nay: 18 |
2016-05-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 63 Nay: 59 |
2016-04-30 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Masterson, Senator Denning and Senator Kelly appointed as second conferees |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-29 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Ryckman, Representative Schwartz and Representative Henry appointed as second conferees |
2016-04-29 | House | House Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2016-04-29 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2016-03-22 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Ryckman, Representative Schwartz and Representative Henry appointed as conferees |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Masterson , Senator Denning and Senator Kelly as conferees |
2016-03-21 | House | House Final Action - Substitute passed as amended; Yea: 114 Nay: 8 |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Substitute bill be passed as amended |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Representative Hutton was adopted |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Representative Hutton |
2016-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted recommending substitute bill be passed |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-01-14 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, January 19, 2016, 9:00 AM Room 112-N |
2015-05-06 | House | House Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-06 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 1 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 23, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Senate Introduced |