KS SB243 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and counties prohibited from regulating lemonade or other beverage stands operated by minors in residential areas.
Title
Cities and counties prohibited from regulating lemonade or other beverage stands operated by minors in residential areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Prefiled for Introduction on Tuesday, December 3, 2019 |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb243/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb243_00_0000.pdf |