KS SB238 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died on General Orders
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Substitute for SB 238 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Updating field of membership requirements of credit unions; allowing privilege tax deductions on certain business and single family residence loans.
Title
Substitute for SB 238 by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance - Updating field of membership requirements of credit unions; allowing privilege tax deductions on certain business and single family residence loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died on General Orders |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending substitute bill be passed by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Assessment and Taxation; Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Introduced |