KS SB235 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - House Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 55 Nay: 69
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Enacting the back to school act to require school districts to provide a full-time, in person attendance option for all students beginning on March 26, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacting the back to school act to require school districts to provide a full-time, in person attendance option for all students beginning on March 26, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Final Action - Passed - Yea: 55 Nay: 69 (Y: 55 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 26 Nay: 12 (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected - Yea: 11 Nay: 25 (Y: 11 N: 25 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-16HouseHouse Final Action - Not passed; Yea: 55 Nay: 69
2021-03-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2021-03-11HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-03-10HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 10, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 546-S
2021-03-03HouseHouse Referred to Committee on K-12 Education Budget
2021-03-03HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-03-03SenateSenate Final Action - Passed; Yea: 26 Nay: 12
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Sykes was rejected Yea: 11 Nay: 25
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Sykes
2021-02-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Education
2021-02-25SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2021-02-15SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-12SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/sb235/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb235_00_0000.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb235_s_1498.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb235_s_1566.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb235_h_1674.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb235_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb235_00_0000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210302150051_770443/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210303112826_035095/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210316111933_856177/

Bill Comments

feedback