KS SB231 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
Pending: Senate Public Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring drug rebate revenues associated with medical assistance enrollees to be deposited into the state general fund and monthly reporting thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring drug rebate revenues associated with medical assistance enrollees to be deposited into the state general fund and monthly reporting thereof.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-29SenateSenate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-21SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, March 21, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N
2019-03-19SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare
2019-03-18SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback