KS SB23 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorized restrictions of driving privileges; ignition interlock device.
Title
Authorized restrictions of driving privileges; ignition interlock device.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn from Calendar; Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-06 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 09, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2015-02-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, February 18, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112-N-CANCELLED |
2015-02-05 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-05 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 21, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |