KS SB221 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died on House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing clubs and drinking establishments to sell beer and cereal malt beverage for consumption off the licensed premises.
Title
Allowing clubs and drinking establishments to sell beer and cereal malt beverage for consumption off the licensed premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died on House Calendar |
2020-03-17 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-03-16 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 16, 2020, 9:00 AM Room 346-S |
2020-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Francisco was adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Francisco |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 19, 2020, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, March 20, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 144-S |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |