KS SB214 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a civil remedy statute for human trafficking victims; specifying restitution measures for such victims and directing certain restitution to the human trafficking victim assistance fund; changing statutory references to the crimes of human trafficking and commercial sexual exploitation of a child.
Title
Creating a civil remedy statute for human trafficking victims; specifying restitution measures for such victims and directing certain restitution to the human trafficking victim assistance fund; changing statutory references to the crimes of human trafficking and commercial sexual exploitation of a child.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-25 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-02-26 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-26 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 18, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Corrections and Juvenile Justice |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Introduced |