KS SB213 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting an employer from taking any adverse employment against against an employee because of the employee's vaccination status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting an employer from taking any adverse employment against against an employee because of the employee's vaccination status.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce
2021-03-04SenateSenate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs
2021-02-25SenateSenate Hearing: Thursday, February 25, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S
2021-02-11SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Commerce
2021-02-10SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback