KS SB208 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - House Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 218-N - CANCELED
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creating the fairness in women's sports act to require that female student athletic teams only include members who are biologically female.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating the fairness in women's sports act to require that female student athletic teams only include members who are biologically female.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 24 Nay: 10 (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseHouse Hearing: Tuesday, March 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 218-N - CANCELED
2021-03-19HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Education
2021-03-19HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-03-17SenateSenate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 24 Nay: 10
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-03-17SenateSenate Senator Erickson raised a question of germaneness. The amendment was ruled not germane.
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Corson
2021-03-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-16SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Education
2021-02-23SenateSenate Hearing: Tuesday, February 23, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2021-02-11SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2021-02-10SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback