KS SB203 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-10 - Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the Kansas campus restoration act to address deferred maintenance at state educational institutions, establishing the Kansas campus restoration fund in the state treasury and authorizing certain transfers from the state general fund to such fund.
Title
Enacting the Kansas campus restoration act to address deferred maintenance at state educational institutions, establishing the Kansas campus restoration fund in the state treasury and authorizing certain transfers from the state general fund to such fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Motion to strike from Calendar adopted; |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Friday, February 17, 2023, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Senate Introduced |