KS SB2 | 2016 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee

Summary

Authorizing school districts to offer multi-year contracts to teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing school districts to offer multi-year contracts to teachers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01SenateSenate Died in Committee
2015-01-26SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 28, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 144-S
2015-01-12SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Education
2015-01-12SenateSenate Introduced
2015-01-12SenateSenate Prefiled for Introduction on Monday, December 01, 2014

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback