KS SB197 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Applying the open meetings act to the supreme court nominating commission and judicial district nominating commissions; requiring attorneys to document eligibility to vote in the commission selection process and applying the open records act to such information; requiring certain applicant information to be made available to the public when appointing court of appeals judges.
Title
Applying the open meetings act to the supreme court nominating commission and judicial district nominating commissions; requiring attorneys to document eligibility to vote in the commission selection process and applying the open records act to such information; requiring certain applicant information to be made available to the public when appointing court of appeals judges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 35 Nay: 4 (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2015-03-13 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 18, 2015, 3:30 PM Room 112N |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 35 Nay: 4 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Hensley was adopted |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Hensley |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator King was adopted |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator King |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 18, 2015, 10:30 AM Room 346-S |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |