KS SB194 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending provisions related to the revised uniform anatomical gift act.
Title
Amending provisions related to the revised uniform anatomical gift act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Passed over and retain a place on the calendar |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 12, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 118-N |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Ways and Means; Rereferred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Public Health and Welfare; Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb194/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb194_00_0000.pdf |