KS SB177 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-23 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changing provisions of the employment security law including creation of the unemployment compensation modernization and improvement council, development of a new unemployment insurance information technology system, provision of tax information to claimants, publication of trust fund data, the maximum benefit period, the charging of employer accounts for benefits paid, employer contribution rate determination and schedules, abolishment of the employment security interest assessment fund, crediting of employer accounts for fraudulent or erroneous payments, transfers from the state general fund to the unemployment insurance trust fund for improper benefit payments, changes to the shared work compensation program and other unemployment trust fund provisions.
Title
Changing provisions of the employment security law including creation of the unemployment compensation modernization and improvement council, development of a new unemployment insurance information technology system, provision of tax information to claimants, publication of trust fund data, the maximum benefit period, the charging of employer accounts for benefits paid, employer contribution rate determination and schedules, abolishment of the employment security interest assessment fund, crediting of employer accounts for fraudulent or erroneous payments, transfers from the state general fund to the unemployment insurance trust fund for improper benefit payments, changes to the shared work compensation program and other unemployment trust fund provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Federal and State Affairs; Rereferred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Committee on Commerce; Referred to Committee on Federal and State Affairs |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (opponents) Thursday, February 18, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (neutral) Thursday, February 18, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing continuation: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (proponents) Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (proponents) Tuesday, February 16, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hearing: (proponents) Monday, February 15, 2021, 10:30 AM Room 546-S |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Commerce |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Introduced |