KS SB170 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Portable electronics insurance act.
Title
Portable electronics insurance act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 87 Nay: 36 (Y: 87 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 87 Nay: 36 (Y: 87 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred with amendments in conference - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 87 Nay: 36 (Y: 87 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 87 Nay: 36 (Y: 87 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 38 Nay: 0 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Approved by Governor on Thursday, 12 May 2011 | |
2011-05-06 | Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, May 06, 2011 | |
2011-04-29 | Motion to suspend Joint Rule 4 (k) to allow consideration adopted; | |
2011-04-29 | Concurred with amendments in conference; Yea: 39 Nay: 0 | |
2011-03-23 | Motion to accede adopted; Representative Shultz, Representative Hermanson and Representative Burroughs appointed as conferees | |
2011-03-23 | Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Teichman , Senator Masterson and Senator A. Schmidt as conferees | |
2011-03-22 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 87 Nay: 36 | |
2011-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-03-21 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-03-16 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Insurance | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Insurance | |
2011-02-24 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-23 | Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 38 Nay: 0 | |
2011-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended | |
2011-02-22 | Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted | |
2011-02-17 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced |