KS SB160 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 81 Nay: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 81 Nay: 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the fairness in women's sports act to require that student athletic teams only include members who are of the same biological sex unless designated as coed.
Title
Enacting the fairness in women's sports act to require that student athletic teams only include members who are of the same biological sex unless designated as coed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained - Yea: 81 Nay: 41 (Y: 81 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 28 Nay: 10 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 25 Nay: 13 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 74 Nay: 39 (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Motion to override veto prevailed - Yea: 28 Nay: 10 (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 25 Nay: 13 (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 74 Nay: 39 (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 120 Nay: 2 (Y: 120 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Consent Calendar Passed - Yea: 38 Nay: 1 (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | House | House Motion to override veto failed; Veto sustained; Yea: 81 Nay: 41 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Senate Motion to override veto prevailed; Yea: 28 Nay: 10 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Vetoed by Governor; Returned to Senate on Friday, April 15, 2022 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 25 Nay: 13 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 74 Nay: 39 |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson and Senator Sykes appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference Committee Report agree to disagree adopted; Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman and Representative Ousley appointed as second conferees |
2022-04-01 | House | House Conference committee report now available |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Senator Baumgardner, Senator Erickson, and Senator Sykes are appointed to replace Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Haley on the Conference Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | House Representative Williams, Representative Hoffman, and Representative Winn are appointed to replace Representative Rahjes, Representative Smith, E., and Representative Carlin on the Conference Committee |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Senator Warren, Senator Wilborn, and Senator Haley are appointed to replace Senator Kerschen, Senator Straub, and Senator Ware on the Conference Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | House Motion to accede adopted; Representative Rahjes, Representative Smith, E. and Representative Carlin appointed as conferees |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Senate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Kerschen , Senator Straub and Senator Ware as conferees |
2021-03-25 | House | House Emergency Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 120 Nay: 2 |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2021-03-24 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Agriculture |
2021-03-22 | House | House Hearing: Monday, March 22, 2021, 3:30 PM Room 112-N |
2021-03-03 | House | House Referred to Committee on Agriculture |
2021-03-03 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Consent Calendar Passed Yea: 38 Nay: 1 |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed and placed on Consent Calendar by |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, February 24, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 144-S |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Senate Introduced |