KS SB153 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing contributions to accounts under the Kansas individual data on students program.
Title
Authorizing contributions to accounts under the Kansas individual data on students program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Hearing: Monday, March 12, 2012, 1:30 PM Room 152-S | |
2012-03-06 | Withdrawn from Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance; Referred to Committee on Education | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced |