KS SB149 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
Pending: Senate Ethics, Elections and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Facilitating voter registration by providing certificates of birth for applicants to evidence citizenship upon their consent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitating voter registration by providing certificates of birth for applicants to evidence citizenship upon their consent.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, January 29, 2020, 9:30 AM Room 142-S
2019-02-13SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Ethics, Elections and Local Government
2019-02-12SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback