KS SB142 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Kansas department for aging and disability services; programs for all-inclusive care for the elderly.
Title
Kansas department for aging and disability services; programs for all-inclusive care for the elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed - Yea: 40 Nay: 0 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | House Stricken from Calendar by Rule 1507 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Tuesday, March 10, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 546S |
2015-03-05 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, March 04, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 546S |
2015-03-04 | House | House Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services |
2015-03-04 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Emergency Final Action - Passed; Yea: 40 Nay: 0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed by |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Monday, February 16, 2015, 1:30 PM Room 118-N |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Introduced |