KS SB14 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Evidence based juvenile programs; lapsing and appropriating $6,000,000 state general fund moneys from department of health and environment--division of health care finance to the department of corrections.
Title
Evidence based juvenile programs; lapsing and appropriating $6,000,000 state general fund moneys from department of health and environment--division of health care finance to the department of corrections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Wednesday, January 30, 2019, 10:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/sb14/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2019_20/measures/documents/sb14_00_0000.pdf |