KS SB139 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Members of regional trauma councils and advisory committee on trauma.
Title
Members of regional trauma councils and advisory committee on trauma.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed - Yea: 28 Nay: 11 (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Died in House Committee | |
2011-02-25 | Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-24 | Received and Introduced | |
2011-02-24 | Final Action - Passed; Yea: 28 Nay: 11 | |
2011-02-23 | Committee of the Whole - Be passed | |
2011-02-21 | Committee Report recommending bill be passed by Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to Committee on Public Health and Welfare | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced |