KS SB138 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding and clarifying the property tax exemption for Strother field airport property, increasing the extent of exemption for residential property from the statewide school levy, discontinuing the state tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing financing therefor from the state general fund.
Title
Expanding and clarifying the property tax exemption for Strother field airport property, increasing the extent of exemption for residential property from the statewide school levy, discontinuing the state tax levies for the Kansas educational building fund and the state institutions building fund and providing financing therefor from the state general fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn from Calendar, Rereferred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, February 16, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |