KS SB135 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on May 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-21 - House Died in House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding certain counties to the list of eligible rural opportunity zone counties.
Title
Adding certain counties to the list of eligible rural opportunity zone counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Hilderbrand [R] | Sen. Larry Alley [R] | Sen. Randall Hardy [R] | Sen. Robert Olson [R] |
Sen. Mike Petersen [R] | Sen. Dennis Pyle [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 30 Nay: 8 (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House Died in House Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Hearing: Wednesday, April 3, 2019, 3:00 PM Room 582-N |
2019-03-21 | House | House Referred to Committee on Taxation |
2019-03-21 | House | House Received and Introduced |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 30 Nay: 8 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, February 19, 2019, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate Introduced |