KS SB135 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Senate Died in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Option to exempt aviation fuel from city sales tax.
Title
Option to exempt aviation fuel from city sales tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Senate Died in Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Thursday, March 05, 2015, 9:30 AM Room 548-S CANCELED |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Senate Introduced |
Kansas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/sb135/ |
Text | https://kslegislature.org/li/b2015_16/measures/documents/sb135_00_0000.pdf |