KS SB127 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Senate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 23, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifying the eligibility requirements for restricted driving privileges, increasing the age for eligibility to renew drivers' licenses online to 65, allowing drivers' license renewal notices to be sent electronically, authorizing a waiver of traffic fines for manifest hardship situations and excluding the additional 90-day wait period for driver's license suspension for certain offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifying the eligibility requirements for restricted driving privileges, increasing the age for eligibility to renew drivers' licenses online to 65, allowing drivers' license renewal notices to be sent electronically, authorizing a waiver of traffic fines for manifest hardship situations and excluding the additional 90-day wait period for driver's license suspension for certain offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Conference Committee Report was adopted - Yea: 122 Nay: 0 (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 123 Nay: 1 (Y: 123 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Action - Passed as amended - Yea: 39 Nay: 0 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateSenate Approved by Governor on Friday, April 23, 2021
2021-05-03SenateSenate Enrolled and presented to Governor on Friday, April 16, 2021
2021-04-08SenateSenate Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2021-04-08HouseHouse Conference Committee Report was adopted; Yea: 122 Nay: 0
2021-04-08HouseHouse Conference committee report now available
2021-04-06HouseHouse Motion to accede adopted; Representative Proehl, Representative Delperdang and Representative Helgerson appointed as conferees
2021-03-30SenateSenate Nonconcurred with amendments; Conference Committee requested; appointed Senator Petersen , Senator Claeys and Senator Hawk as conferees
2021-03-30HouseHouse Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 123 Nay: 1
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Be passed as amended
2021-03-29HouseHouse Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-03-25HouseHouse Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2021-03-17HouseHouse Hearing: Wednesday, March 17, 2021, 1:30 PM Room 582-N
2021-03-10HouseHouse Referred to Committee on Transportation
2021-03-10HouseHouse Received and Introduced
2021-03-03SenateSenate Final Action - Passed as amended; Yea: 39 Nay: 0
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Be passed as further amended
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Amendment by Senator Faust-Goudeau was adopted
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Motion to Amend - Offered by Senator Faust-Goudeau
2021-03-02SenateSenate Committee of the Whole - Committee Report be adopted
2021-02-26SenateSenate Committee Report recommending bill be passed as amended by Committee on Transportation
2021-02-17SenateSenate Hearing: Wednesday, February 17, 2021, 8:30 AM Room 546-S
2021-02-03SenateSenate Referred to Committee on Transportation
2021-02-02SenateSenate Introduced

Kansas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/sb127/
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb127_00_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb127_01_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb127_02_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb127_03_0000.pdf
Texthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/sb127_enrolled.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb127_s_1455.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fa_2021_sb127_s_1560.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/cr_2021_sb127_h_1880.pdf
Amendmenthttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccr_2021_sb127_h_2141.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/fisc_note_sb127_00_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb127_01_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb127_02_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/supp_note_sb127_03_0000.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/ccrb_sb127_01_driverslicenses.pdf
Supplementhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/documents/summary_sb_127_2021.pdf
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210303112642_413721/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210330105545_905804/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210408104253_369398/
Roll Callhttp://kslegislature.org/li/b2021_22/measures/vote_view/je_20210408143516_667890/

Bill Comments 750

feedback