KS SB125 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S
Pending: Senate Assessment and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing income tax net operating loss carryback from the sale of certain historic hotels.
Title
Allowing income tax net operating loss carryback from the sale of certain historic hotels.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Hearing: Tuesday, March 21, 2023, 9:30 AM Room 548-S |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Referred to Committee on Assessment and Taxation |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate Introduced |